EP1433038 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF DISTRIBUTING SECURITY POLICIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Networks Associates Technology, Inc. 3965 Freedom Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGLETON, Richard B. 4 Coral Close Eaton Bray, Bedfordshire LU6 2AS / GB | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02759582.6 | 06.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002US28513 | Priority number, date | US20010969686 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: US 969686 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03029941 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433038 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (US);
G06F16/178 (EP,US);
G06F21/56 (US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/604 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
H04L63/0218 (EP,US);
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERTEILUNG VON SICHERHEITSPOLITIK | [2004/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF DISTRIBUTING SECURITY POLICIES | [2004/27] | French: | SERVEUR DE PROC DURES DE S CURIT DE BASE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6158010 (MORICONI MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * column 3 - column 4 *; | [X]WO0078004 (ALCATEL INTERNETWORKING INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15,17-31,33-45,47,48 * the whole document *; | [X] - SYMANTEC CORPORATION, "Norton Antivirus Corporate Edition Implementation Guide", NORTON ANTIVIRUS CORPORATE EDITION 7.0, (19991012), pages 14,16-32,45-48,75,76,93,94,107,143 - 147,155,156,159,160,183,184, URL: ftp://ftp.symantec.com/public/english_international/Manuals_WhitePapers/navcorped7_ig.pdf, (20031216), XP002265694 [X] 1-48 * page 17 - page 18 * * page 22 - page 24 * * page 155 * * page 160 * | [X] - "KEEPING PASSWORDS IN SYNC ACROSS MULTIPLE DOMAINS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (1995), vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, page 265, XP000498765 [X] 1,5,6,8,11,15,16,18,21,25,27,28,31,32,35,41,42,45,46 * the whole document * | [A] - SYMANTEC CORPORATION, "E-security begins with sound security policies", SECURITY, (20010614), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://enterprisesecurity.symantec.com/SecurityServices/factsheets/esecurityhandbook.pdf, (20031216), XP002265695 [A] 1 * page 11 * |