EP1441858 - METHOD FOR ISOLATING ALEURONE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG Bahnhofstrasse 9240 Uzwil / CH | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHM, Arturo Schlattrainstrasse 16 CH-9242 Oberuzwil / CH | 02 /
KRATZER, Andreas Freiestrasse 38 CH-8032 Zürich / CH | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Frommhold, Joachim Bühler AG Patentabteilung 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Frommhold, Joachim, Dr. Bühler AG Patentabteilung 9240 Uzwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 02760037.8 | 02.10.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002CH00547 | Priority number, date | DE2001154462 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154462 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03039754 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441858 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441858 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B03C7/00, A23L1/10 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
B03C7/006 (EP,US);
A23L7/115 (EP,US);
A23L7/198 (EP,US);
B03C7/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON ALEURONTEILCHEN | [2004/32] | English: | METHOD FOR ISOLATING ALEURONE PARTICLES | [2004/32] | French: | PROCEDE D'ISOLATION DE PARTICULES D'ALEURONE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.03.2006 | CZ | 22.03.2006 | EE | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | IE | 22.03.2006 | SK | 22.03.2006 | TR | 22.03.2006 | BG | 22.06.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | SE | 22.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | LU | 02.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 22.03.2006 | |
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
TR | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
LU | 02.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 22.03.2006 | |
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IE | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 22.03.2006 | |
IE | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | IE | 22.03.2006 | |
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | SK | 22.03.2006 | |
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SK | 22.03.2006 | |
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | BG | 22.06.2006 | |
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SE | 22.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8504349 (UNIV TROBE [AU]) [X] 1,2,10-13,15,19,27,29,31,32,34,48,50,51,53-55 * page 12, line 3 - page 14, line 31; figures 1,2; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0980713 (LEHMANN MASCHF F B [DE]) [A] 1,3-8,31,34,47,50,53* column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 38; figure 1; claims 1-3,6,10,13,21 * |