EP1483436 - PNEUMATIC THREAD TENSIONER AND THREAD HANDLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IROPA AG Oberneuhofstrasse 6 6340 Baar / CH | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEFSSON, Pär Polonäsgränd 67 S-502 51 Boras / SE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker, August Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02760248.1 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002EP07971 | Priority number, date | SE20020000745 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: SE 0200745 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03076704 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1483436 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483436 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/00 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
D04B15/44 (EP,KR,US);
B65H59/10 (KR);
B65H59/105 (EP,US);
D03D47/34 (EP,KR,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, SE, TR [2006/36] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHER FADENSTRECKER UND FADENVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/50] | English: | PNEUMATIC THREAD TENSIONER AND THREAD HANDLING SYSTEM | [2004/50] | French: | ETIREUR DE FIL PNEUMATIQUE ET SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE FIL | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 27.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.12.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 06.09.2006 | |
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | SE | 06.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]GB1469533 (NAT RES DEV) [YD] 7 * page 5, line 37 - line 60; figure 4 * [A] 1; | [A]US4637229 (TAYLOR JR JAMES W [US]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH05209343 ; | [A]JPH01314762 ; | [AD]US5816296 (SCHUSTER RAINER [DE]) [AD] 7 * column W *; | [A]WO0015532 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE], et al) [A] * page 7, line 27 - line 29; figure 2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931206), vol. 017, no. 655, Database accession no. (C - 1136), & JP05209343 A 19930820 (NORIMASA SHODA;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900305), vol. 014, no. 115, Database accession no. (C - 0696), & JP01314762 A 19891219 (SADAO SAWADA) [A] 1,7 * abstract * |