EP1428553 - ADAPTIVE ELECTROSTIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nadtochiy, Alekcandr Ivanovich ul. Instrumentalnaya, 39B-7 Taganrog, 347900 / RU | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADTOCHIY, Alekcandr Ivanovich ul. Instrumentalnaya, 39B-7 Taganrog, 347900 / RU | 02 /
GRINBERG, Yakov Zalmanovich ul. Shaumayana, 25-25 Tagonrog, 347909 / RU | 03 /
FINAEV, Valeriy Ivanovich ul. Chekhova, 6-25 Taganrog, 347900 / RU | 04 /
ZENKIN, Maksim Vitalievich ul. P. Toliatti, 22/2A-27 Taganrog, 347900 / RU | 05 /
UVAROV, Sergey Nikolaevich ul. Chekhova, 6-141 Taganrog, 347900 / RU | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr. Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02760941.1 | 29.07.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002RU00358 | Priority number, date | RU20010123470 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: RU 2001123470 | [2004/25] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018118 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428553 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/36021 (EP,US);
A61N1/326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER ELEKTROSTIMULATOR | [2004/25] | English: | ADAPTIVE ELECTROSTIMULATOR | [2004/25] | French: | ELECTROSTIMULATEUR ADAPTATIF | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | Translation filed | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 06.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2005 | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2006 | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2007 | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9839061 (CADENT MEDICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-6* pages 1-61; figures 1,2,8,13 * | International search | [A]US5257623 (KARASEV ALEXANDR A [SU], et al); | [A]RU2068277 (KARASEV ALEKSANDR A [SU]); | [A]RU2155614 (NADTOCHIJ ALEKSANDR IVANOVICH); | [A]RU2162353 (KARASEV ALEKSANDR ALEKSANDROVI) |