EP1408779 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ON-LINE MIXING AND APPLICATION OF SURFACE COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | [2010/15] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | ||
For all designated states Sokhey, Avtar 4615 Dartford Road Englewood, OH 45322 / US | |||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states THE IAMS COMPANY 7250 Poe Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US | ||
For all designated states Sokhey, Avtar 4615 Dartford Road Englewood, OH 45322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOKHEY, Avtar 4615 Dartford Road Englewood, OH 45322 / US | 02 /
BOEBEL, Katherine, P. 1284 Enterprise Road West Alexandria, OH 45381 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al The Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2008/29] | den Hartog, Jeroen H.J., et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31 st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2008/09] | Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02761151.6 | 22.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US23328 | Priority number, date | US20010307229P | 23.07.2001 Original published format: US 307229 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03009710 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408779 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408779 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/08, A23K1/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A23K50/42 (EP,US);
A23K10/16 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K40/30 (EP,US);
A23L29/065 (EP,US);
A23P20/11 (EP,US);
A23P20/15 (EP,US);
A23P20/18 (EP,US);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US);
Y10S426/807 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ON-LINE MISCHEN UND AUFTRAGEN VON OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL | [2004/17] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ON-LINE MIXING AND APPLICATION OF SURFACE COATING COMPOSITIONS FOR FOOD PRODUCTS | [2004/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MELANGE ET D'APPLICATION EN LIGNE DE COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT DE SURFACE POUR DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | IE | 22.07.2010 | LU | 22.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.07.2010 | ||
LU | 22.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
IE | 22.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1572761 (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4518696 (GEHRMAN SYBIL H [US], et al) [X] 13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5011679 (SPANIER HENRY C [US], et al) [A] 5* the whole document *; | [X]EP0682874 (EWOS AB [SE]) [X] 13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5645878 (BRESLIN JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8-17 * figure 4 * * column 9, line 1 - line 55 *; | [X]US5968569 (CAVADINI CHRISTOF [CH], et al) [X] 13 * column 5, line 15 - line 67 * * claims 1-12 *; | [X]US6056822 (JEFFERSON WAYNE A [US], et al) [X] 13 * column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 7 * * column 2, paragraph 7 * * column 2, paragraph 11 * * column 4, paragraph 7 - paragraph 10 * * column 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * column 10, paragraph 11 - column 11, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | US5645878 | US6056822 |