EP1420703 - APPARATUS FOR MACHINING HARD TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2006/41] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states SDGI Holdings, Inc. 1800 Pyramid Place Memphis, Tennessee 38132 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIL, Carlos 24266 S.E. 11th Place Sammamish, WA 98029 / US | 02 /
TOKISH, Len 24817 S.E. 38th Street Issaquah, WA 98029 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02761425.4 | 20.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002US26356 | Priority number, date | US20010934507 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: US 934507 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017853 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420703 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420703 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61B17/02 (EP,US);
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
A61B17/162 (EP,US);
A61B17/1624 (EP,US);
A61B17/1659 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1602 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON HARTEM GEWEBE | [2004/22] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MACHINING HARD TISSUE | [2004/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'USINAGE D'UN TISSU DUR | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2007 | BE | 14.03.2007 | CY | 14.03.2007 | CZ | 14.03.2007 | DK | 14.03.2007 | EE | 14.03.2007 | FI | 14.03.2007 | IT | 14.03.2007 | SK | 14.03.2007 | TR | 14.03.2007 | BG | 14.06.2007 | SE | 14.06.2007 | GR | 15.06.2007 | PT | 14.08.2007 | GB | 20.08.2007 | IE | 20.08.2007 | LU | 20.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
BG | 14.06.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
GB | 20.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
LU | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CY | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
GB | 20.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
EE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
GB | 20.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
GB | 20.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
IE | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
IT | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
GR | 15.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
DK | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SK | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
BE | 14.03.2007 | ||
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
PT | 14.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 14.03.2007 | |
FI | 14.03.2007 | ||
SE | 14.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 14.03.2007 | |
SE | 14.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3574374 (KELLER DONALD D, et al) [X] 1-14,16,17,19-27,30-55 * column 2, line 40 - line 50; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19653580 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 15,18,28,29* abstract *; | [DX]US6083228 (MICHELSON GARY K [US]) [DX] 25 * column 12, line 13 - line 44; figures 16,17B,20 *; | [PX]WO0211633 (SPINAL DYNAMICS CORP [US], et al) [PX] 25 * page 94, line 15 - page 95, line 6; figures 70A-70E *; | [DE]US2002151901 (BRYAN VINCENT [US], et al) [DE] 25 * page 2, paragraph 22; figure 2 * | by applicant | US6083228 |