EP1441994 - FUSED SILICA HAVING HIGH INTERNAL TRANSMISSION AND LOW BIREFRINGENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMEY, Jeffrey John 26 Maple Street Canton, NY 13617 / US | 02 /
HESLIN, Michael Robert 6969 Morgan Circle Victor, NY 14564 / US | 03 /
LADISON, Julie L 7 Mechanic Street Canton, NY 13617 / US | 04 /
LINDER, Michael Werner 2769 Spencer Hill Road Corning, NY 14830 / US | 05 /
MAXON, John E 17 Wells Street Canton, NY 13617 / US | 06 /
MOLL, Johannes 23 Tall Meadow Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 07 /
PAVLIK, JR., Robert S 214 Walnut Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | 08 /
SEMPOLINSKI, Daniel R 5 Overbrook Road Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02761645.7 | 13.09.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US29116 | Priority number, date | US20010325950P | 27.09.2001 Original published format: US 325950 P | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027035 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441994 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/06 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
G03F7/70966 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70958 (EP,US);
C03C2201/21 (EP,US);
C03C2201/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Title | German: | QUARZGUT MIT HOHER INTERNER TRANSMISSION UND KLEINER DOPPELBRECHUNG | [2004/32] | English: | FUSED SILICA HAVING HIGH INTERNAL TRANSMISSION AND LOW BIREFRINGENCE | [2004/32] | French: | SILICE FONDUE A FORTE TRANSMISSION INTERNE ET FAIBLE BIREFRINGENCE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 18.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5523266 (NISHIMURA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5896222 (ROSPLOCK CYNTHIA K [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 40 - line 45; claim - *; | [X]US5958809 (FUJIWARA SEISHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - line 65; table 3 *; | [X]US6087283 (JINBO HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1103528 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* table - * | International search | [X]US5958809 (FUJIWARA SEISHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5668067 (ARAUJO ROGER J [US], et al); | [XP]US6333283 (URANO AKIRA [JP], et al); | [X]US6291377 (KOMINE NORIO [JP], et al); | [XP]US2002082157 (YOSHIDA AKIKO [JP], et al) |