EP1436907 - AUTOMATIC FREQUENCY CORRECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIME DIVISION DUPLEX MODES OF 3G WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERNBERG, Gregory S. 50 Brompton Road, Apartment 2B Great Neck, NY 11021 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter P.O. Box 86 03 68 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02761840.4 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US30802 | Priority number, date | US20010325505P | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 325505 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03030400 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436907 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/7087 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/709 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7097 (KR);
H04L2027/0065 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES FREQUENZKORREKTURVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ZEITMULTIPLEXBETRIEBSARTEN DER DRAHTLOSEN 3G-KOMMUNIKATION | [2004/29] | English: | AUTOMATIC FREQUENCY CORRECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TIME DIVISION DUPLEX MODES OF 3G WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE CORRECTION DE FREQUENCE AUTOMATIQUE ET APPAREIL POUR MODES DUPLEX A REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL DE TROISIEME GENERATION | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 01.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5684836 (NAGAYASU TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US6181923 (KAWANO OSAMU [JP], et al) |