EP1430624 - COMPENSATOR AND METHOD FOR POLARISATION-MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/26] | COMPENSATOR FOR POLARISATION-MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATION | ||
[2012/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/26] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Michael Charles 38 Byron Avenue Colchester Essex CO3 4HG / GB | 02 /
WALKER, Stuart Douglas, University of Essex Wivenhoe Park Colchester Essex CO4 3SQ / GB | [2013/26] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
PARKER, Michael Charles 38 Byron Avenue, Colchester Essex CO3 4HG / GB | ||
02 /
WALKER, Stuart Douglas, University of Essex Wivenhoe Park, Colchester Essex CO4 3SQ / GB | Representative(s) | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762589.6 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002GB04391 | Priority number, date | GB20010023428 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0123428 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03030410 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430624 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430624 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/2569 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H04B10/2569 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | H04B10/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2013/25] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMPENSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION DER POLARISATIONSMODENDISPERSION | [2012/50] | English: | COMPENSATOR AND METHOD FOR POLARISATION-MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATION | [2012/50] | French: | COMPENSATEUR ET PROCEDE POUR COMPENSATION DE DISPERSION EN MODE DE POLARISATION | [2012/50] |
Former [2004/26] | KOMPENSATOR ZUR KOMPENSATION DER POLARISATIONSMODENDISPERSION | ||
Former [2004/26] | COMPENSATOR FOR POLARISATION-MODE DISPERSION COMPENSATION | ||
Former [2004/26] | COMPENSATEUR POUR COMPENSATION DE DISPERSION EN MODE DE POLARISATION | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06026523.8 / EP1786122 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1067715 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-28 * column 3, paragraph 15 - column 7, paragraph 42 * * column 8, paragraph 47 - column 9, paragraph 55 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6271952 (EPWORTH RICHARD EDWARD [GB]) [A] 1-28 * column 5, line 16 - column 8, line 8 * * column 8, lines 41-63 * * column 10, line 1 - column 11, line 53 * * figures 1-7,12,13 *; | [A]EP1087245 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 20 - page 6, paragraph 24 * * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 10 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO0161385 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1,16,23,28 * abstract * * figures 1,3,6 * |