EP1421118 - A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF BONE EROSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Yukie, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDA, Chie, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 03 /
OHTSUKI, Masahiko, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, LIMITED 2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762875.9 | 27.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002JP08630 | Priority number, date | JP20010257436 | 28.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001257436 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020768 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421118 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C07K16/46, A61P19/02, A61P19/10 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K39/39541 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
C07K16/2878 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VERHINDERUNG DES KNOCHENABBAUS | [2004/22] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF BONE EROSION | [2004/22] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE TRAITEMENT OU DE PREVENTION DE L'EROSION OSSEUSE | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0071160 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-27; | EP1180369 [ ] (SANKYO CO [JP]) [ ] * claims 1-7 * * page 2, line 19 - line 31 * * page 3, line 14 - page 11, line 29 *; | [Y] - RODAN GIDEON A ET AL, "Therapeutic approaches to bone diseases.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (2000), vol. 289, no. 5484, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1508 - 1514, XP002219949 [Y] 1-27 * page 1509, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 1509, column M, paragraph 2 * * page 1511, column M, paragraph 1 * * page 1512; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.289.5484.1508 | [Y] - TEITELBAUM STEVEN L, "Bone resorption by osteoclasts.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (2000), vol. 289, no. 5484, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1504 - 1508, XP002219950 [Y] 1-27 * page 1504, column M, paragraph 1 * * page 1505, column M, paragraph 2 * * page 1506, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.289.5484.1504 | [Y] - MATSUNO H ET AL, "Treatment of rheumatoid synovitis with anti-reshaping human interleukin-6 receptor monoclonal antibody: Use of rheumatoid arthritis tissue implants in the SCID mouse model.", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (199811), vol. 41, no. 11, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2014 - 2021, XP001069959 [Y] 28-31 * abstract * * page 2015, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 2015, column R, paragraph 5 * * page 2020, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1529-0131(199811)41:11<2014::AID-ART17>3.0.CO;2-T | [Y] - SUZUKI Y ET AL, "Osteoclast-like cells in an in vitro model of bone destruction by rheumatoid synovium.", RHEUMATOLOGY (OXFORD), (200106), vol. 40, no. 6, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 673 - 682, XP001120111 [Y] 28-31 * abstract * * page 674, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 675, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 680, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.6.673 |