EP1433859 - METHOD OF DETERMINING TARGET PROTEIN OF DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Sreenath V. 42, Oak Hill Drive Sayre, PA 18840 / US | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Chitose, c/o Tokyo Research Laboratories 10-3-201, Yamadahigashi 4-chome Suita-shi, Tokyo 565-0821 / JP | 03 /
NAKANO, Hirofumi, c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. BioFrontier Labs, 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
SHARMA, Sreenath V. 42, Oak Hill Drive Sayre, PA 18840 / US | ||
02 /
ONEYAMA, Chitose, c/o TOKYO RESEARCH LABORATORIES 10-3-201, Yamadahigashi 4-chome Suita-shi, Tokyo 565-0821 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKANO, Hirofumi, c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-6, Asahi-machi 3-chome, Machida-shi Tokyo 194-8533 / JP | |||
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
SHARMA, Sreenath V. 42, Oak Hill Drive Sayre, PA 18840 / US | ||
02 /
ONEYAMA, Chitose, c/o TOKYO RESEARCH LABORATORIES 10-3-201, Yamadahigashi 4-chome Suita-shi, Tokyo 565-0821 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKANO, Hirofumi, c/o Kyowa Hakko Kogyo Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome, Choyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8185 / JP | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762979.9 | 03.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002JP08923 | Priority number, date | JP20010265732 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001265732 | [2004/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020960 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1433859 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433859 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, G01N33/68, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N27/26 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N27/447 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | C12Q1/37, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, G01N27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ZIELPROTEINS EINES ARZNEISTOFFS | [2004/27] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING TARGET PROTEIN OF DRUG | [2004/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION D'UNE PROTEINE CIBLE D'UN MEDICAMENT | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | Translation filed | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2006 | BE | 29.11.2006 | CY | 29.11.2006 | CZ | 29.11.2006 | EE | 29.11.2006 | FI | 29.11.2006 | IT | 29.11.2006 | NL | 29.11.2006 | SK | 29.11.2006 | TR | 29.11.2006 | BG | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | SE | 28.02.2007 | GR | 01.03.2007 | ES | 12.03.2007 | PT | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CY | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
EE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 01.03.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
SK | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
IT | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 12.03.2007 | ||
PT | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
BE | 29.11.2006 | ||
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 29.11.2006 | |
FI | 29.11.2006 | ||
NL | 29.11.2006 | ||
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 29.11.2006 | |
BG | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5585277 (BOWIE JAMES U [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 5 - column 6 *; | [A]EP0770876 (SCRIPTGEN PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document, see especially p. 5 and example 8 *; | [A]WO9859360 (CIPHERGEN BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document, see especially p. 6 *; | [AD] - SHIMIZU N ET AL, "High-performance affinity beads for identifying drug receptors", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (200008), vol. 18, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 877 - 881, XP002203018 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/78496 | International search | [A]EP0770876 (SCRIPTGEN PHARM INC [US]); | [A]EP1085097 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |