EP1424367 - COMPOSITION, AMPHOTERIC POLYMERIC FLOCCULANT AND USE OF BOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8419 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states TOAGOSEI CO., LTD. 14-1, Nishishimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8419 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Yoshio Macromolecular Mat. Research Labs. of Toagosei Co., Ltd. 1-1, Funamicho, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-0027 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Koichi Macromolecular Mat. Research Labs of Toagosei Co., Ltd. 1-1, Funamicco, Minato-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 455-0027 / JP | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut, et al Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Kilian, Helmut, et al Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | Pohlmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Phys. WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02763001.1 | 04.09.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002JP08974 | Priority number, date | JP20010268001 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001268001 | JP20010314507 | 11.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001314507 | [2004/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020829 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424367 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, B01D21/01, C02F11/14 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
D21H21/10 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
B01D21/01 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C08L101/02 (EP,US);
C02F11/147 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND AMPHOTERES POLYMERES FLOCKUNGSMITTEL SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2004/23] | English: | COMPOSITION, AMPHOTERIC POLYMERIC FLOCCULANT AND USE OF BOTH | [2004/23] | French: | COMPOSITION, FLOCULANT POLYMERIQUE AMPHOTERE, ET UTILISATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION ET DE CE FLOCULANT | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | Translation filed | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 30.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0231900 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0411654 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [I]JPH08209588 (SEIKO KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0012] - [0017]; tables 1-3 *; | [A]WO9946207 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-19* page 9, line 3 - page 11, line 9; claim 1 *; | [A]JP2000202500 (SONY CORP, et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000218297 (MITSUI CYTEC KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001071000 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001179300 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | International search | [X]US6225395 (NZUDIE DENIS TEMBOU [FR], et al); | [A]JPH08112504 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JPH0688030 (ROEHM GMBH); | [A]JPS63252600 (MITSUI CYANAMID KK) |