EP1423589 - A METHOD OF TORQUE MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargine Engineering AB Kompanigatan 10 254 38 Helsingborg / SE | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDMAN, Mats Båvensvik SE-640 34 Sparreholm / SE | [2007/33] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
HEDMAN, Mats Bavensvik SE-640 34 Sparreholm / SE | Representative(s) | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar, et al Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02763152.2 | 29.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002SE01536 | Priority number, date | SE20010002990 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: SE 0102990 | [2004/23] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03023209 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423589 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423589 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/06, F02D17/02 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F01L9/10 (EP,US);
F01L9/16 (EP,US);
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F02B69/06 (EP,US);
F02D13/0253 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F02D17/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/3058 (EP,US);
F02B1/12 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US);
F02D13/0284 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0012 (EP,US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DREHMOMENTREGELUNG | [2004/23] | English: | A METHOD OF TORQUE MODULATION | [2004/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE MODULATION DU COUPLE | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2002 | Translation filed | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.08.2007 | BE | 15.08.2007 | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | IE | 29.08.2007 | LU | 29.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LU | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
BE | 15.08.2007 | ||
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 15.08.2007 | |
CH | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4489695 (KOHAMA TOKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US4509488 (FOERSTER HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]US4541387 (MORIKAWA KOJI [JP]); | [A]US5377631 (SCHECHTER MICHAEL M [US]) | Examination | JPH10227226 | DE19951093 |