EP1509857 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING INFORMATION COLLECTION, STORAGE, AND DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC. American Express Tower, World Financial Center New York, NY 10285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY, INC. American Express Tower, World Financial Center New York, NY 10285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALOCHE, Donald, M. 5780 N.E. 14th Road Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334 / US | 02 /
MANEPALLI, Rao, S. 1163 Fairlane Trace, 1506 Weston, FL 33326 / US | 03 /
MILLS, Randy 872 Brightwood Way Wellington, FL 33414 / US | 04 /
MUNIZ, Ana 1987 N.W. 170 Terrace Pembroke Pines, FL 33028 / US | 05 /
RUTTER, Mark 22367 North 71st Lane Glendale, AZ 85310 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02763246.2 | 09.07.2002 | [2005/09] | WO2002US21674 | Priority number, date | US20020160583 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 160583 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102818 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509857 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/958 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERMÖGLICHEN DES SAMMELNS, SPEICHERNS UND VERTEILENS VON INFORMATIONEN | [2005/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FACILITATING INFORMATION COLLECTION, STORAGE, AND DISTRIBUTION | [2005/09] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FACILITER LA COLLECTE, LE STOCKAGE ET LA DISTRIBUTION D'INFORMATIONS | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 28.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5761662 (DASAN VASANTHAN S [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 1-53 * * column 5, line 53 - column 8, line 40; figures 4-11 *; | [X]WO0122310 (ZOMMERS OLEG KHARISOVICH [RU]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 17 - page 6, line 11 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 28 * * page 24, line 1 - page 26, line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]US2001037348 (NAKADA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0037]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0066]; figures 6-8 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] *; | [A]WO0186497 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO0207009 (KNOWNOW INC [US]) [A] 1,10* abstract * | International search | [A]US6119106 (MERSKY RANDY [US], et al); | [A]US6260059 (UENO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5761662 |