EP1419235 - KNOCK IN TRANSGENIC MAMMAL CONTAINING A NON-FUNCTIONAL N-TERMINUS OF KV BETA 1.1 SUBUNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Seung, Poon 38C Chicopee Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
RHODES, Kenneth, James 808 Atkinson Circle Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 03 /
MARQUIS, Karen, Lovell 269 Rock Run Road Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 04 /
COMERY, Thomas, Anthony 219 Flowers Avenue Langhorne, PA 19047 / US | 05 /
ASKEW, Roger 11 High Ridge Road Boxford, MA 01921 / US | 06 /
BRANDT, Michael, Richard 16 Lenape Road Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 07 /
ROSENZWEIG-LIPSON, Sharon, Joy 25 Bosko Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/08] | Denholm, Anna Marie, et al Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Patents & Trade Marks Department Huntercombe Lane South Taplow, Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | ||
Former [2004/21] | Ingham, Stephen H. Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Patents & Trade Marks Dept., Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berks SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763360.1 | 25.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002US23790 | Priority number, date | US20010308485P | 27.07.2001 Original published format: US 308485 P | US20010331140P | 09.11.2001 Original published format: US 331140 P | [2004/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03012041 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1419235 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C12N15/63, C12N5/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/00, A01K67/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0356 (EP,US);
C07K2319/42 (EP,US);
C12N2800/30 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/21] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSGENER KNOCK-IN-SÄUGER MIT NICHTFUNKTIONELLEM N-TERMINUS DER K V- BETA-1.1-UNTEREINHEIT | [2004/21] | English: | KNOCK IN TRANSGENIC MAMMAL CONTAINING A NON-FUNCTIONAL N-TERMINUS OF KV BETA 1.1 SUBUNIT | [2004/21] | French: | CHOC DANS UN ANIMAL TRANSGENIQUE CONTENANT UNE EXTREMITE N-TERMINALE NON FONCTIONNELLE D'UNE SOUS-UNITE KV BETA 1.1 | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - RETTIG J ET AL, "INACTIVATION PROPERTIES OF VOLTAGE-GATED K+ CHANNELS ALTERED BY PRESENCE OF BETA-SUBUNIT", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (19940526), vol. 369, no. 6478, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 289 - 294, XP002036596 [A] 1-97 * page 291, column R, paragraph 2 * * figure 3f * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/369289a0 | [A] - WISSMANN R ET AL, "NMR structure and functional characteristics of the hydrophilic N terminus of the potassium channel beta-subunit Kvbeta1.1.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 10 DEC 1999, (19991210), vol. 274, no. 50, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 35521 - 35525, XP002460738 [A] 1-97 * figures 1,2 * * page 35524, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.50.35521 | [A] - BÄHRING R ET AL, "Coupling of voltage-dependent potassium channel inactivation and oxidoreductase active site of Kvbeta subunits.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 22 JUN 2001, (20010622), vol. 276, no. 25, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 22923 - 22929, XP002460739 [A] 1-97 * page 22928, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M100483200 | [PX] - KWAK S P ET AL, "Creation and characterization of Kvbeta1.1 knock-in mice lacking the N-terminus necessary for rapid inactivation", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, & 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; NOVEMBER 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0190-5295, page 2145, XP002460147 [PX] 1-97 * abstract * | [PX] - COMERY T A ET AL, "Mice expressing an inactive Kvbeta1.1 subunit, but not Kvbeta1.1 knockout mice, display impaired contextual fear conditioning and different profiles on the elevated zero maze", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, & 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; NOVEMBER 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0190-5295, page 2145, XP002460148 [PX] 1-97 * abstract * | [PX] - BRANDT M R ET AL, "Effects of knockout or inactive Kvbeta1.1 subunits on spatial learning and nociception in genically modified mice", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, & 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA; NOVEMBER 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. 2, ISSN 0190-5295, page 2146, XP002460149 [PX] 1-97 * abstract * | [PX] - AIMOND FRANCK ET AL, "Modulation of voltage-gated K+ currents in mouse ventricular myocytes by KVbeta1 subunits", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, & 46TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE BIOPHYSICAL SOCIETY; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; FEBRUARY 23-27, 2002, (200201), vol. 82, no. 1 Part 2, ISSN 0006-3495, page 26a, XP002460150 [PX] 1-97 * abstract * | [T] - BRENNAN J A ET AL, "MICE EXPRESSING AN INACTIVE KVbeta1.1 SUBUNIT DISPLAY AN ANXIOLYTIC PHENOTYPE IN STRESS - INDUCED HYPERTHERMIA AND FOUR - PLATE MODELS.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 32ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE; ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA; NOVEMBER 02-07, 2002, (2002), vol. 2002, pages Abstract No. 398.12 URL - http://sf, XP002460146 [T] 1-97 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO0024871 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [YP]US6365370 (DUBIN ADRIENNE E [US], et al); | [AE]US2003024001 (KWAK SEUNG P [US], et al); | [Y] - PONHD O. ET AL., "Functional and molecular aspects of voltage-gated K+ channel beta subunits", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (19990430), vol. 868, pages 344 - 355, XP001119013 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1999.tb11296.x |