EP1425677 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASYNCHRONOUS CLIENT SERVER SESSION COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MasterObjects, Inc. Sanatoriumlaan 67 3705 AN Zeist / NL | [2018/40] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Masterobjects Reigerskamp 393 3607 HX Maarssen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN OORD, Stefan, M. Mouterspad 244 NL-1383 DK Weesp / NL | 02 /
SMIT, Mark, H. Reigerskamp 393 NL-3607 HX Maarssen / NL | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1EE / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Weitzel, David Stanley Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763441.9 | 14.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002US25729 | Priority number, date | US20010933493 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: US 933493 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03021462 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425677 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425677 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G06F16/338 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/986 (EP,US);
G06F40/174 (US);
G06F40/274 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
G06F3/0237 (US);
G06F40/211 (US);
G06F8/33 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ASYNCHRONEN CLIENT-SERVER-SESSION-KOMMUNIKATION | [2004/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ASYNCHRONOUS CLIENT SERVER SESSION COMMUNICATION | [2004/24] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA COMMUNICATION ASYNCHRONE EN SESSIONS DE CLIENT-SERVEUR | [2018/31] |
Former [2004/24] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA COMMUNICATION ASYNCHRONE EN SESSIONS DE CLIENT-SERVEUR | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2010 | 31.08.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2010 | 31.08.2015 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5802292 (MOGUL JEFFREY CLIFFORD [US]) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 2, line 20 - column 2, line 45 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 25 * * column 4, line 32 - column 4, line 52 *; | [A]US5845300 (COMER ROSS WARD [US], et al) [A] 1-27* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5581753 (TERRY DOUGLAS B [US], et al); | [A]US5634127 (CLOUD DONALD M [US], et al); | [A]US5701461 (DALAL KETAN K [US], et al); | [A]US5928335 (MORITA TETSUYA [JP]); | [A]US6003085 (RATNER MITCHELL [US], et al); | [A]US6067514 (CHEN CHENGJUN JULIAN [US]); | [A]US6092100 (BERSTIS VIKTORS [US], et al); | [A]US6247043 (BATES CARY LEE [US], et al) | by applicant | US5802292 |