EP1434831 - STABILIZED COATING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 901 3rd Ave. South P.O. Box 1461 Minneapolis, MN 55440-1461 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Valspar Sourcing, Inc. 1101 Third Street South Minneapolis, MN 55415 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGLEITER, Jason, M. 535 North Lewis Run Road, 402 Jefferson Hills, PA 15025 / US | 02 /
O'BRIEN, Robert, M. 163 Ridge Road Monongahela, PA 15063 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02763491.4 | 20.08.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US26520 | Priority number, date | US20010317705P | 06.09.2001 Original published format: US 317705 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022957 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434831 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434831 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09K17/32, C08F279/02, C09D163/00, C09D201/00, C08L53/02, C08K3/08 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C09D133/068 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (EP);
C08F290/061 (EP);
C08F290/064 (EP);
C09D163/00 (EP);
C09D201/00 (EP);
C09D4/06 (EP);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C08L27/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/068, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09D163/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09D201/00, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/28] | English: | STABILIZED COATING COMPOSITIONS | [2004/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVETEMENT STABILISEES | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 01.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2005 | CZ | 16.03.2005 | EE | 16.03.2005 | FI | 16.03.2005 | IT | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | SK | 16.03.2005 | TR | 16.03.2005 | BG | 16.06.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | ES | 27.06.2005 | CY | 20.08.2005 | LU | 20.08.2005 | IE | 22.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/39] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
EE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
IT | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
CY | 20.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
EE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
CY | 20.08.2005 | ||
LU | 20.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
EE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
CY | 20.08.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
EE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
TR | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
IE | 22.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
CZ | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
ES | 27.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4778851 (HENTON DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 2, line 5 - line 56 * * column 3, line 9 - line 29 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0291260 (WHITTAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 3, line 3 - line 21 * * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 25 ** abstract *; | [X]EP0449359 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-38 * page 2, line 32 - line 43 * * page 5, line 12 - line 52 * * abstract *; | [X]US5082698 (ANDERSON KARL P [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 13 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0565206 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-38 * page 3, line 4 - line 51 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0576756 (VALSPAR CORP [US]) [X] 1-38 * page 2, line 36 - line 46 * * page 3, lines 4-11 * * abstract *; | [X]US5641818 (SWEET DAVID EUGENE [US]) [X] 1-38 * column 1, line 13 - line 19 * * column 3, line 13 - line 32 * * abstract *; | [X]US6124401 (HART JR DONALD P [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 10 * * column 9, line 13 - line 15 * * abstract * |