EP1395380 - CONTINUOUS PRESSURE MOLTEN METAL SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING CONTINUOUS METAL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center, 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center, 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPLE, Vivek, M., c/o Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 02 /
REIGHARD, Scott, E., c/o Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 03 /
PAOLA, Vincent, A., c/o Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 04 /
CHABAL, Ronald, G., c/o Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Bergen, Klaus, et al Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Bergen, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764237.0 | 18.04.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002US12362 | Priority number, date | US20010284952P | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 284952 P | US20010957846 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 957846 | US20010014649 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: US 14649 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02085557 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395380 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395380 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/00, B22D11/10, B21C33/02, B21C23/00 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
B22D17/2015 (EP,US);
B21C33/02 (EP,US);
B22D11/00 (EP,US);
B22D11/10 (EP,US);
B22D17/20 (EP,US);
B22D17/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | 18.11.2003 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ZUFUHR VON METALLSCHMELZE UNTER KONSTANTEM DRUCK UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ENDLOSMETALLARTIKELN | [2004/11] | English: | CONTINUOUS PRESSURE MOLTEN METAL SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING CONTINUOUS METAL ARTICLES | [2004/11] | French: | SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN METAL LIQUIDE PAR PRESSION CONTINUE, ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'ARTICLES METALLIQUES CONTINUS | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06010464.3 / EP1714718 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | BE | 16.08.2006 | CH | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | LI | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | LU | 18.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
LU | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]RU2161546 ; | [A]JPS63199016 ; | [X]GB2156253 (MANNESMANN AG) [X] 52-57,60,62-70 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 37 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0223078 (METACON AG [CH]) [X] 52-57,60-70 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5431213 (JOUET-PASTRE LAURENT [FR]) [X] 52-57,60,62-70 * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 64 * * figures 2-5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 24, Database accession no. 2001-233151, XP002243433 & RU2161546 C 20010110 (DK TREIDING CO LTD) [X] 52-57,60-70 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881214), vol. 012, no. 478, Database accession no. (M - 775), & JP63199016 A 19880817 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] 1-51 * abstract * |