EP1383983 - METHOD OF RECYCLING WATER CONTAMINATED OIL BASED DRILLING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-I L.L.C. 5950 North Course Drive Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Frank, Manfred, Franz Fjellstoellevein 6 N-4027 Stavanger / NO | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Brochard, Pascale Osha Liang 32 Avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Brochard, Pascale Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2004/05] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02764349.3 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US13171 | Priority number, date | US20010286236P | 24.04.2001 Original published format: US 286236 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086280 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383983 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383983 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/06, B01D17/04, C10G33/04 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
E21B21/068 (EP,US);
B01D17/0208 (EP,US);
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B01D17/047 (EP,US);
C10G33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON WASSER VERUNREINIGT DURCH AUF ÖL-BASIERENDER BOHRFLÜFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2004/05] | English: | METHOD OF RECYCLING WATER CONTAMINATED OIL BASED DRILLING FLUID | [2004/05] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RECYCLER UN FLUIDE DE FORAGE A BASE D'HUILE CONTAMINEE PAR DE L'EAU | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.03.2009 | 19.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.2009 | BE | 02.12.2009 | CY | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | PT | 02.04.2010 | IE | 24.04.2010 | LU | 24.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.04.2010 | ||
LU | 24.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
IE | 24.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
BE | 02.12.2009 | ||
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 02.12.2009 | |
SE | 02.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4269271 (SHUPE RUSSELL D, et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 6 - line 61 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 58 *[A] 9,10; | [Y]US5195847 (GUYMON E PARK [US]) [Y] 1,5 * column 2, line 24 - line 27 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 32 *; | [Y]WO9635040 (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,5 * page 10, line 13 - page 13, line 18 *; | [YP]US6267716 (QUINTERO LIRIO [US]) [YP] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 56 * | by applicant | EP0271943 | US5254531 | - H. C. H. DARLEY; GEORGE R. GRAY, Composition and Properties of Drilling and Completion Fluids, GULF PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1988), pages 328 - 332 |