EP1419010 - ROLLER GRINDING MILL AND METHOD FOR GRINDING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN MAGNETIZABLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loesche GmbH Hansaallee 243 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRONZ, Hartmut Hahnenwinkel 84 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Heim, Hans-Karl Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Heim, Hans-Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764781.7 | 25.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002EP08309 | Priority number, date | DE2001141414 | 23.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10141414 | [2004/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018203 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1419010 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419010 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B02C15/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B02C15/001 (EP,US);
B02C15/14 (KR);
B02B3/04 (KR);
B02C15/00 (EP,KR,US);
B02C15/005 (EP,US);
B02C15/12 (KR);
B02C2015/002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄLZMÜHLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMAHLUNG VON STOFFEN MIT MAGNETISIERBAREN BESTANDTEILEN | [2004/21] | English: | ROLLER GRINDING MILL AND METHOD FOR GRINDING MATERIALS THAT CONTAIN MAGNETIZABLE COMPONENTS | [2004/21] | French: | BROYEUR A ROULEAUX ET PROCEDE POUR BROYER DES MATERIAUX COMPORTANT DES ELEMENTS MAGNETISABLES | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 27.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.12.2005 | CZ | 07.12.2005 | EE | 07.12.2005 | FI | 07.12.2005 | IE | 07.12.2005 | NL | 07.12.2005 | SK | 07.12.2005 | BG | 07.03.2006 | SE | 07.03.2006 | PT | 08.05.2006 | AT | 25.07.2006 | LU | 25.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
EE | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
AT | 25.07.2006 | ||
LU | 25.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
EE | 07.12.2005 | ||
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
AT | 25.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
AT | 25.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
IT | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
IE | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
PT | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
BG | 07.03.2006 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 07.12.2005 | |
FI | 07.12.2005 | ||
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SK | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 07.12.2005 | |
NL | 07.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3951347 (TIGGESBAUMKER PETER, et al) [A] 1,4,14 * column 3, line 64 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]US4442582 (FOO GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 14 * column 4, line 18 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US5676318 (YOKOYAMA SADAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,14 * column 3, line 46 - line 55 * * column 7, line 13 - line 15 * * figure . *; | [A]FR2785220 (SOC D CONSTRUCTION DE MACHINES [FR]) [A] 14 * page 10, line 17 - line 20 * * page 12, line 3 - line 18 ** figure 6 * |