EP1433235 - MOTOR CONTROL CIRCUIT OVERCURRENT PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Co. Ltd. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Minebea Co. Ltd. 4106-73 Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0293 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIKE, Nigel David 2234 E Mountain Sky Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85046 / US | 02 /
RIDDOCH, Henry 3 The Kyles, Wemyss Bay Renfewshire PA18 6AF / GB | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
STRIKE, Nigel David 43 Tidworth Road, Ludgershall Andover SP11 9QE / GB | ||
02 /
RIDDOCH, Henry 3 The Kyles, Wemyss Bay Renfewshire PA18 6AF / GB | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2004/27] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02765073.8 | 03.10.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002GB04466 | Priority number, date | GB20010023988 | 05.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0123988 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032460 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1433235 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433235 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/08 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
H02P29/02 (EP,US);
H02H7/0838 (EP,US);
H02P6/26 (EP,US);
H02H3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/26] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERSTROMSCHUTZ FÜR MOTORSTEUERUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2004/27] | English: | MOTOR CONTROL CIRCUIT OVERCURRENT PROTECTION | [2004/27] | French: | PROTECTION DE SURINTENSITE POUR CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE MOTEUR | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2005 | BE | 27.07.2005 | CH | 27.07.2005 | CZ | 27.07.2005 | EE | 27.07.2005 | FI | 27.07.2005 | LI | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | SK | 27.07.2005 | TR | 27.07.2005 | CY | 03.10.2005 | IE | 03.10.2005 | BG | 27.10.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | ES | 07.11.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
EE | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SK | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SK | 27.07.2005 | ||
TR | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SK | 27.07.2005 | ||
IE | 03.10.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SK | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
SK | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
BE | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
CH | 27.07.2005 | ||
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
LI | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
ES | 07.11.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 27.07.2005 | |
FI | 27.07.2005 | ||
BG | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4317176 (SAAR DAVID A, et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 8; figure 4 *; | [A]US4694374 (VERBANETS JR WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1* column 13, line 52 - column 14, line 7 * |