EP1430407 - SCALABLE HOME CONTROL PLATFORM AND ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'DONNEL, Ciaran Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Roche, Denis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Roche, Denis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards 156 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02765208.0 | 04.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002IB03686 | Priority number, date | US20010961125 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 961125 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027870 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430407 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430407 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F13/42, H04L12/28 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
G06F13/4063 (EP,US);
G06F13/40 (KR);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE HAUSSTEUERPLATTFORM UND -ARCHITEKTUR | [2004/26] | English: | SCALABLE HOME CONTROL PLATFORM AND ARCHITECTURE | [2004/26] | French: | ARCHITECTURE ET PLATE-FORME DOMOTIQUES EXTENSIBLES | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2006 | BE | 19.04.2006 | CH | 19.04.2006 | CY | 19.04.2006 | CZ | 19.04.2006 | EE | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | LI | 19.04.2006 | NL | 19.04.2006 | SK | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | BG | 19.07.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | IE | 04.09.2006 | LU | 04.09.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
TR | 19.04.2006 | ||
BG | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
LU | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
BG | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
IE | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
BE | 19.04.2006 | ||
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 19.07.2006 | |
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 19.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5570356 (FINNEY DAMON W [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]EP0921472 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US6167077 (DUCAROIR FRANCOIS [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |