EP1440325 - RADIO-FREQUENCY COIL WITH TWO PARALLEL END CONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLLE, Eerke Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02765290.8 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002IB04313 | Priority number, date | EP20010204045 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: EP 01204045 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03036318 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440325 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440325 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
G01R33/34046 (EP,US);
G01R33/422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | RF-SPULE MIT ZWEI PARALLELEN ENDLEITERN | [2004/31] | English: | RADIO-FREQUENCY COIL WITH TWO PARALLEL END CONDUCTORS | [2004/31] | French: | BOBINE RADIOFREQUENCE COMPORTANT DEUX CONDUCTEURS PARALLELES D'EXTREMITE | [2007/38] |
Former [2004/31] | BOBINE RADIOFREQUENCE COMPORTANT DEUX CONDUCTEURS D'EXTREMITE PARALLELE | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 31.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | IE | 17.10.2008 | LU | 17.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 17.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 17.10.2008 | ||
LU | 17.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 17.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
IE | 17.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 24.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0213665 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [D]US4737718 (KEMNER RUDOLF [NL], et al); | [A]EP0322192 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 3, line 37 - column 7, line 34 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5646531 (RENZ WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8 * column 2, line 115 - column 58 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]US6133737 (GREIM HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 18 * * figure 1 * |