EP1436959 - MULTI-USER DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenslet Ltd. 12 Hahilazon Street 52522 Ramat-Gan / IL | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLEV SHTEIMAN, Arkady 5b/7 David Hamelech Street 51418 Bnei Brak / IL | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 02765312.0 | 03.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002IL00726 | Priority number, date | IL20010145245 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: IL 14524501 | IL20020150133 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: IL 15013302 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021972 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1436959 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/06, G06E1/04 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H04B1/7105 (EP,US);
H04B1/7093 (EP,US);
H04B1/71057 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | H04L27/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRBENUTZERDETEKTION | [2004/29] | English: | MULTI-USER DETECTION | [2004/29] | French: | DETECTION MULTI-UTILISATEURS | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4777614 (WARD JEREMY S [GB]) [Y] 14,15* column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 8 *; | [XY] - YENER A ET AL, "A nonlinear programming approach to CDMA multiuser detection", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, 1999. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-THIRD ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON OCT. 24-27, 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), ISBN 0-7803-5700-0, pages 1579 - 1583, XP010373896 [X] 3-8,12 * the whole document * [Y] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1999.832014 | International search | [A]US5272726 (FURUYA YUKITSUNA [JP], et al); | [A]US5537443 (YOSHINO HITOSHI [JP], et al) |