EP1422991 - METHOD FOR INCREASING STRESS TOLERANCE IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona P.O. Box 210151 Tucson AZ 85721-0151 / US | [2008/32] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states The Arizona Board of Regents on Behalf of the University of Arizona Babcock Building, Room 3205, 1717 E. Speedway Boulevard, P.O. Box 210151 Tucson, AZ 85721 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Jian -Kang 626 N. Norton Avenue Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | 02 /
Xiong, Liming 791 Wiggens Ferry Drive, Apt. B St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/23] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02766000.0 | 06.09.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US25964 | Priority number, date | US20010317724P | 06.09.2001 Original published format: US 317724 P | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03022032 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1422991 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422991 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/415, A01H5/00 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/13 (EP,KR,US);
A01H1/00 (KR);
A01F1/00 (KR);
C12N15/8273 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | A01F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER STRESSTOLERANZ BEI PFLANZEN | [2004/23] | English: | METHOD FOR INCREASING STRESS TOLERANCE IN PLANTS | [2004/23] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ACCROITRE LA RESISTANCE AU STRESS CHEZ LES PLANTES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2012 | 06.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GB | 06.09.2013 | IE | 06.09.2013 | LU | 06.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GB | 06.09.2013 | ||
IE | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GB | 06.09.2013 | ||
IE | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GB | 06.09.2013 | ||
IE | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
IE | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - "Arabidopsis thaliana molybdenum cofactor sulfurase mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20010904), Database accession no. AY034895, URL: EBI, XP002403457 [X] 27-84 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26 | [XY] - "Arabidopsis thaliana molybdenum cofactor sulfurase mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20010226), Database accession no. AF325457, URL: EBI, XP002403458 [X] 27-84 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26 | [A] - HÖFGEN R ET AL, "Manipulation of thiol contents in plants.", AMINO ACIDS. 2001, (20010301), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0939-4451, pages 291 - 299, XP002403454 [A] 1-84 * the whole document * | [PXY] - XIONG L ET AL, "Cell signaling during cold, drought, and salt stress", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (2002), vol. 14, no. SUPPL, ISSN 1040-4651, pages S165 - S183, XP002273466 [PX] 27-84 * the whole document * [PY] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.010278 | [XY] - XIONG L ET AL, "The arabidopsis LOS5/ABA3 locus encodes a molybdenum cofactor sulfurase and modulates cold stress- and osmotic stress-responsive gene expression", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (20010901), vol. 13, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 2063 - 2083, XP002964026 [X] 27-84 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.13.9.2063 | International search | [Y] - SAGI ET AL., "Nitrate reductase and molybdenum cofactor in annual ryegrass as affected by salinity and nitrogen source", PHYSIOL. PLANT, (1997), vol. 99, pages 546 - 553, XP002964022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-3054.1997.990405.x | [AP] - SAGI ET AL., "The absence of molybdenum cofactor sulfuration is the primary cause of the flacca phenotype in Tomato plants", PLANT J., (2002), vol. 31, pages 305 - 317, XP002964023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.2002.01363.x | [AP] - MENDEL ET AL., "Molybdoenzymes and molybdenum cofactor in plants", J. EXP. BOT., (200208), vol. 53, no. 375, pages 1689 - 1698, XP002964024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jxb/erf038 | [AP] - BITTNER ET AL., "ABA3 is a molybdenum cofactor sulfurase required for activation of aldehyde oxidase and xanthine dehydrogenase in arabidopsis thaliana", J. BIOL. CHEM., (20011102), vol. 276, no. 44, pages 40381 - 40384, XP002964025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C100472200 | [Y] - XIONG ET AL., "The arabidopsis LOS5/ABA3 locus encodes a molybdenum cofactor sulfurase and modulates cold stress- and osmotic stress-responsive gene expression", PLANT CELL, (200109), vol. 13, pages 2063 - 2083, XP002964026 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.13.9.2063 | by applicant | - KARIMI ET AL., TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (200205), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 193 - 195 | - ZHU, J.K.; HASEGAWA, P.M.; BRESSAN, RA., "Molecular aspects of osmotic stress in plants", CRIT. REV. PLANT SCI., (1997), vol. 16, pages 253 - 277 |