EP1451801 - HANDHELD COMPUTER WITH VARIABLE SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/13] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77707 / US | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Palm, Inc. 950 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Palm, Inc. 950 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Palm, Inc. MS 4205, 400 N. McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, William 113 Shorebird Circle Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
SLOTHOWER, Anna-Pia 569 Bridgeway Sausalito, CA 94965 / US | 03 /
LAM, Lawrence 6313 Tucker Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 04 /
GIOSCIA, Rich 2773 Glomietta Circle Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2008/26] |
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
WEBB, William 113 Shorebird Circle Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | ||
02 /
SLOTHOWER, Anna-Pia 569 Bridgeway Sausalito, CA 94965 / US | |||
03 /
LAM, Lawrence 6313 Tucker Drive San Jose, CA 95129 / US | |||
04 /
BIOSCHIA, Rich 2773 Glomietta Circle Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Potter, Julian Mark Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP, The Rectory, 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Illingworth-Law, William, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02766017.4 | 15.08.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US26197 | Priority number, date | US20010932213 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: US 932213 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017245 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451801 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G06F1/16 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H04M1/0237 (EP,US);
G06F1/1624 (EP,US);
G06F1/1643 (EP,US);
G06F1/1675 (EP,US);
G06F1/1683 (EP,US);
G06F1/169 (EP,US);
G06F3/0202 (EP,US);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1632 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN DER HAND GEHALTENER COMPUTER MIT VARIABLER GRÖSSE | [2004/36] | English: | HANDHELD COMPUTER WITH VARIABLE SIZE | [2004/36] | French: | ORDINATEUR PORTABLE A TAILLE VARIABLE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 | 31.08.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2009 | 31.08.2015 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2289595 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,6,8,9,14,19,27,28,41,43 * page 9, line 7 - page 10, line 24 ** page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 9; figures 3A-3C,9A-9C *; | [XA]EP1051012 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,14,19-21,27,28,41-43 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013]; figures 2-6 * [A] 8,9; | [XA]JP2001024762 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6,8,9,14,27,28 * abstract * [A] 10,19,41,43; | [XA]EP1107101 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,6,7,14,27,28,41,43 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1a,1b * [A] 4,8,9,19; | [PX]EP1220517 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PX] 1,4,6,7,9,11-14,19-21,27,28,41-43 * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 8; figure 1 * | International search | [AE]US6445577 (MADSEN BRENT D [US], et al); | [AE]US6483697 (JENKS KENNETH [US], et al) |