EP1428301 - POLARIZED CONNECTOR FOR FLAT FLEXIBLE CIRCUITRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | [2007/24] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPOTTIER, Yves 929 West Liberty Street, Apartment 1 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | 02 /
FUERST, Robert, M. 2606 Alden Court West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | 03 /
PFAFFINGER, David, A. 3286 Grange Hall Road Holly, MI 48442 / US | 04 /
LOHMAN, Jonathan, D. 131 Arbor Avenue West Chicago, IL 60185 / US | [2004/34] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
LEPOTTIER, Yves 862 University Place Grosse Pointe, MI 48230 / US | ||
02 /
FUERST, Robert, M. 2606 Alden Court West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | |||
03 /
PFAFFINGER, David, A. 3286 Grange Hall Road Holly, MI 48442 / US | |||
04 /
LOHMAN, Jonathan, D. 131 Arbor Avenue West Chicago, IL 60185 / US | Representative(s) | Kampfenkel, Klaus Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Kampfenkel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02766255.0 | 06.09.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002US28528 | Priority number, date | US20010960170 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 960170 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028168 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428301 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428301 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/645 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H01R13/645 (EP,KR,US);
H01R12/59 (EP,US);
H01R12/772 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLARISIERTER VERBINDER FÜR FLACHE FLEXIBLE SCHALTUNGEN | [2004/25] | English: | POLARIZED CONNECTOR FOR FLAT FLEXIBLE CIRCUITRY | [2004/25] | French: | CONNECTEUR POLARISE POUR CIRCUITS FLEXIBLES PLATS | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]FR2562338 (NOZICK JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 15 * * figures 3-5 * [A] 8,11 [Y] 4; | [YA]EP0399654 (ITT [US]) [Y] 4 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 35; figures 2,4-6 * [A] 1,3,5,7,8,10,11 |