EP1545364 - REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC PATIENT RESTRAINTS FOR RADIATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-Tec Iowa, Inc. 1401 8th Street, S.E., P.O. Box 320 Orange City, IA 51041 / US | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Med-Tec Iowa, Inc. 1401 8th Street, S.E., P.O. Box 320 Orange City, IA 51041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGEMACH, Robert P.O. Box 320 Orange City, IA 51041 / US | 02 /
NIBBELINK, Jeff P.O. Box 320 Orange City, IA 51041 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02766503.3 | 04.10.2002 | [2005/26] | WO2002US31816 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004032781 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545364 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545364 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61B90/18 (EP,US);
A61B90/14 (EP,US);
A61B90/17 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE THERMOPLASTISCHE PATIENTENHALTERUNG FÜR RADIOTHERAPIE | [2005/26] | English: | REINFORCED THERMOPLASTIC PATIENT RESTRAINTS FOR RADIATION THERAPY | [2005/26] | French: | ELEMENTS THERMOPLASTIQUES RENFORCES DE RETENUE DE PATIENT POUR RADIOTHERAPIE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 28.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5370117 (MCLAURIN JR ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 7 - column 5, line 28; figure 5 *; | [X]US5595191 (KIRK JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,15,16 * figures 10,11 *; | [X]WO9702942 (ALK ASSOCIATES [DK], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1 - page 2; figures 3A,3B *; | [A]US5702406 (VILSMEIER STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* column 1, line 6 - column 9, line 22; figures 1A-1C *; | [A]US5775337 (HAUGER TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 12; figure 7 *; | [A]US6161237 (TANG WEN THYE [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 2; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1095640 (PLANET MEDICAL [DK]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 8; figures 2,5 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 33 * |