EP1450785 - METHOD OF TREATING DERMATOSES USING AVERMECTIN COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parks, L. Dean 4185 SE 20th Street Ocala FL 34471 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Parks, L. Dean 2420 Southwest 15th Street Ocala, FL 34471 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Schmid, Wolfgang, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02766531.4 | 03.10.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US32001 | Priority number, date | US20010976915 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: US 976915 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032976 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450785 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450785 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/35, A61P17/10, A61P17/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61K31/35 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | A61K31/35 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DERMATOSEN MIT EINER AVERMECTIN-VERBINDUNG | [2004/36] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING DERMATOSES USING AVERMECTIN COMPOUND | [2004/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DERMATOSES AU MOYEN D'UN COMPOSE D'AVERMECTINE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0855180 (SODA AROMATIC [JP]); | [E]US2002156029 (PARKS L DEAN [US]) [E] 1-7* claims 1-6 * | International search | [Y]US5728719 (MILLER THOMAS A [US]); | [X]US5952372 (MCDANIEL WILLIAM ROBERT [US]) |