EP1390938 - INFORMATION DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PureDepth Limited Unit G 24 Morrin Road, Panmure Auckland / NZ | [2009/01] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states PureDepth Limited Unit G 24 Morrin Road, Panmure Auckland / NZ | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Deep Video Imaging Limited Airport Road, Mystery Creek, R D 2 Hamilton, 2001 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYMOUR, Bruce, David 38 Provencher Drive Plainville, CT 06062 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02766697.3 | 01.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002NZ00079 | Priority number, date | NZ20010511444 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: NZ 51144401 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02089102 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1390938 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390938 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09F19/14, G09F19/12 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
G09F19/12 (EP,KR,US);
G09F19/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06T11/60 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | G09F19/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSANZEIGE | [2004/09] | English: | INFORMATION DISPLAY | [2004/09] | French: | AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 14.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | LU | 01.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
LU | 01.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4472737 (IWASAKI KENJI [JP]); | [A]EP0454423 (TFE HONG KONG LIMITED [HK]); | [A]US5367801 (AHN YOUNG [US]); | [A]US5764317 (SADOVNIK LEV S [US], et al); | [X]WO9942889 (POWER BEAT INTERNATIONAL LIMIT [NZ], et al); | [X]WO0115128 (DEEP VIDEO IMAGING LTD [NZ], et al) | by applicant | NZ314566 | NZ328074 | NZ329130 | WO9942889 | WO9944095 | WO0115128 |