EP1420994 - GUIDING ELEMENT FOR A STEERING SHAFT FIXING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta Aktiengesellschaft Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | [2009/47] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIML, Roland Fornacherstrasse 6 A-4870 Vöcklamarkt / AT | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalt Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Secklehner, Günter Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 02766918.3 | 27.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002AT00253 | Priority number, date | AT20010001362 | 28.08.2001 Original published format: AT 136201 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018383 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420994 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420994 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/184 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B62D1/184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | 23.02.2004 | LT | 23.02.2004 | LV | 23.02.2004 | MK | 23.02.2004 | RO | 23.02.2004 | SI | 23.02.2004 | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE LENKWELLENFIXIEREINRICHTUNG | [2004/22] | English: | GUIDING ELEMENT FOR A STEERING SHAFT FIXING DEVICE | [2004/22] | French: | ELEMENT DE GUIDAGE DESTINE A UN DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN ARBRE DE DIRECTION | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.05.2006 | CZ | 10.05.2006 | EE | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | IE | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | SK | 10.05.2006 | TR | 10.05.2006 | BG | 10.08.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | AT | 27.08.2006 | LU | 27.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
TR | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
AT | 27.08.2006 | ||
LU | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
AT | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
AT | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
AT | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
AT | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IE | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 10.05.2006 | |
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]GB2295219 (TORRINGTON CO [GB]) [X] 1,16,28-30,36,41-44,52-55 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 12; figures 7,10 *[A] 17,46,56,63,64,67 |