EP1436449 - DRIVE DEVICE FOR THE DRAWING DEVICES OF A SPINNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20, Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Horst Rigistrasse 8 CH-8185 Winkel / CH | [2004/29] | Application number, filing date | 02767031.4 | 15.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002CH00566 | Priority number, date | DE20011051647 | 15.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10151647 | [2004/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033786 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436449 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/22, D01H5/82, H02P7/74 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
D01H1/22 (EP);
D01H5/82 (EP);
H02P5/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEB FÜR STRECKWERKE EINER SPINNEREIMASCHINE | [2004/29] | English: | DRIVE DEVICE FOR THE DRAWING DEVICES OF A SPINNING MACHINE | [2004/29] | French: | MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT DE BANCS D'ETIRAGE D'UN METIER A FILER | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0349831 (RIETER AG MASCHF) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 9 * * column 9, line 3 - line 19; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4,6-10; | [DA]DE2911378 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6216430 (OPPERMANN INGO) [A] 1-10 * column W * |