EP1401311 - KITCHEN VESSEL WITH A HEATING BASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLRUNG, Dirk Bedastr. 3 45239 Essen / DE | 02 /
KÖCHEL, Matthias Steinklippe 42 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | 03 /
WEBER, Klaus, Martin Weissenburgdtrasse 33 42107 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
BIELZER, Raffael Hauptstr. 137b 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
HELLRUNG, Dirk Bedastr. 3 45239 Essen / DE | ||
02 /
KÖCHEL, Matthias Steinklippe 42 45549 Sprockhövel / DE | |||
03 /
WEBER, Klaus, Martin Sedanstr. 47 42281 Wuppertal / DE | |||
04 /
BIELZER, Raffael Hauptstr. 137b 51399 Burscheid / DE | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 02767156.9 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002EP07017 | Priority number, date | DE20011031482 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10131482 | DE20021026939 | 17.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10226939 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03001952 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1401311 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1401311 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A47J27/2105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜCHENGEFÄSS MIT EINEM HEIZBODEN | [2004/14] | English: | KITCHEN VESSEL WITH A HEATING BASE | [2004/14] | French: | RECIPIENT DE CUISINE A FOND CHAUFFANT | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.08.2007 | DK | 22.08.2007 | EE | 22.08.2007 | FI | 22.08.2007 | GB | 22.08.2007 | IE | 22.08.2007 | NL | 22.08.2007 | SK | 22.08.2007 | TR | 22.08.2007 | BG | 22.11.2007 | SE | 22.11.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 22.08.2007 | |
DK | 22.08.2007 | ||
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
GB | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
EE | 22.08.2007 | ||
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
GB | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
GB | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
SE | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
GB | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
SK | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 22.08.2007 | |
FI | 22.08.2007 | ||
IE | 22.08.2007 | ||
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 22.08.2007 | |
NL | 22.08.2007 | ||
BG | 22.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 22.08.2007 | |
BG | 22.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9810489 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2317991 (PIFCO LTD [GB]) [Y] 14,17-27 * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 13 ** page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US5842346 (HSU CHARLES J [US]) [Y] 15,16 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 25; figure 4 * [A] 11-13; | [XY]DE19830181 (INTER CONTROL KOEHLER HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 2, lines 7-11 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 23 * * abstract * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 5-8,14-27; | [A]US5971810 (TAYLOR JOHN CRAWSHAW [GB]) [A] * column 7, line 19 - line 45; figures 1,3 *; | [PY]WO0178457 (WATLOW POLYMER TECHNOLOGY [US]) [PY] 5-7 * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 21 * |