EP1412429 - FLAMEPROOFED THERMOPLASTIC MOLDING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEPRÄGS, Michael Schafweideweg 7 67256 Weisenheim / DE | [2004/18] | Application number, filing date | 02767169.2 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002EP07338 | Priority number, date | DE2001132056 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132056 | [2004/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004564 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412429 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412429 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE THERMOPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN | [2004/18] | English: | FLAMEPROOFED THERMOPLASTIC MOLDING COMPOUNDS | [2004/18] | French: | MATIERES DE MOULAGE THERMOPLASTIQUES IGNIFUGEES | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 12.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | IE | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10182894 ; | [A]EP0979845 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-10* claims 1-7 *; | [XY]DE19920913 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * page 11, line 51 - line 53 * [Y] 5,6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10182894 A 19980707 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * |