EP1419056 - RIGID AXLE FOR A VEHICLE, COMPRISING INTEGRATED TRAILING ARMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOST-Werke GmbH Siemensstrasse 2 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABRAT, Dunja Wettesinger Strasse 11 34479 Breuna / DE | 02 /
SCHÜTTE, Olaf Holländische Strasse 43 34127 Kassel / DE | [2004/21] | Representative(s) | Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Arnulfstraße 58 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | RLTG Ruttensperger Lachnit Trossin Gomoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arnulfstraße 58 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02767238.5 | 20.07.2002 | [2004/21] | WO2002EP08118 | Priority number, date | DE20011040856 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140856 | [2004/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018334 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1419056 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1419056 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1419056 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60G9/00, B60B35/02 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B60G9/003 (EP,US);
B60B35/006 (EP,US);
B60B2310/302 (EP,US);
B60B2310/305 (EP,US);
B60B2360/10 (EP,US);
B60B2360/141 (EP,US);
B60G2200/31 (EP,US);
B60G2204/1226 (EP,US);
B60G2206/30 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/147 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/43] |
Former [2008/50] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTARRACHSE MIT INTEGRIERTEN LÄNGSLENKERN | [2004/21] | English: | RIGID AXLE FOR A VEHICLE, COMPRISING INTEGRATED TRAILING ARMS | [2004/21] | French: | ESSIEU RIGIDE DE VEHICULE AVEC BRAS OSCILLANTS LONGITUDINAUX INTEGRES | [2004/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 04.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative Christophersen & Partner Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE BPW Bergische Achsen KG Ohlerhammer 51674 Wiehl / DE Opponent's representative Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Feldstrasse 73 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | 19.10.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.12.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.09.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4768839 (SPINDLER DIETMAR E [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 11 - line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5409254 (MINOR THOMAS O [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 43 - line 68; figures 2,4 *; | [A]FR2793736 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * page 5, line 26 - line 31; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE29616257U |