EP1407182 - END-FITTING FOR FLEXIBLE HOSE WITHOUT PRESSURE ARCH AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton 6-8, Allée de l'Arche Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states TECHNIP FRANCE ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTON, Hugues 6, rue de l'Eglise F-76940 La Mailleraye-sur-Seine / FR | 02 /
LECLERC, Olivier 14, le Haut des Cours F-76330 Norville / FR | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/16] | Bertrand, Didier Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02767539.6 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002FR02281 | Priority number, date | FR20010008941 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0108941 | [2004/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004921 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1407182 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407182 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/01 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
F16L33/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDANSCHLUSSSTÜCK FÜR SCHLAUCH OHNE DRUCKGEWÖLBE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/16] | English: | END-FITTING FOR FLEXIBLE HOSE WITHOUT PRESSURE ARCH AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2004/16] | French: | EMBOUT POUR CONDUITE FLEXIBLE SANS VO TE DE PRESSION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 22.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | CZ | 08.06.2005 | EE | 08.06.2005 | FI | 08.06.2005 | IT | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | SK | 08.06.2005 | TR | 08.06.2005 | CY | 01.07.2005 | LU | 01.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | BG | 08.09.2005 | GR | 08.09.2005 | SE | 08.09.2005 | ES | 19.09.2005 | PT | 08.11.2005 | DE | 01.02.2006 | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
EE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
EE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
CY | 01.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
EE | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 08.08.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
TR | 08.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
DE | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
SK | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
CZ | 08.06.2005 | ||
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
NL | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
GR | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
ES | 19.09.2005 | ||
PT | 08.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
FI | 08.06.2005 | ||
BG | 08.09.2005 | ||
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 08.06.2005 | |
SE | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 08.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9919655 (NKT CABLES AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1,8 * abstract * * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 22 *; | [A]US6039083 (LOPER COBIE W [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** column 5, lines 7-23 * | by applicant | FR2214852 | WO9725564 | WO9919655 | FR2816389 |