EP1450585 - SOLID-STATE SELF-EMISSION DISPLAY AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Masahiko, c/o Hitachi Res. Lab. Hitachi, Ltd 7-1-1, Omika-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-1292 / JP | 02 /
SHIMADA, Toshikazu, c/o Central Research Lab. Hitachi , Ltd., 1-280, Higashikoigakubo Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 03 /
SHIIKI, Masatoshi, c/o Central Research Lab. Hitachi, Ltd., 1-280, higashikoigakubo Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 04 /
ODA, Shunri, c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku, Tokyo 152-8552 / JP | 05 /
KOSHIDA, Nobuyoshi, c/o Tokyo Univ. of Agriculture and Technology, 2-24-16, Nakamachi Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-8588 / JP | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Röhl, Wolf Horst, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. Sparing-Röhl-Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02768140.2 | 30.09.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002JP10190 | Priority number, date | JP20010305857 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001305857 | [2004/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032690 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450585 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, H05B33/10, H05B33/22 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
H05B33/145 (EP,US);
H05B33/10 (EP,US);
H05B33/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | RÖHRENLOSE SELBSTEMISSIONSANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/35] | English: | SOLID-STATE SELF-EMISSION DISPLAY AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD | [2004/35] | French: | ECRAN A EMISSION SPONTANEE A L'ETAT SOLIDE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2004 | Translation filed | 27.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9921934 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X] - SHOSAKU TANAKA ET AL, "Phosphor Handbook, ELECTROLUMINESCENCE MATERIALS", PHOSPHOR HANDBOOK, XX, XX, (19990101), pages 601 - 612, XP002402737 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - W. L. WILSON, ET. AL., "Quantum Confinement in Size-Selected, Surface-Oxidized Silicon Nanocrystals", SCIENCE, AAAS, (1993), vol. 262, pages 1242 - 1244, XP002528814 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.262.5137.1242 | International search | [A]JPH05206515 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JPH097499 (TAZAKI AKIRA, et al); | [A]JPH0992167 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2000265166 (SONY CORP); | [AE]WO0191155 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) |