EP1437899 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safetel Ltd. Spyrou Kyprianou, 61 SK HOUSE 4003, Limassol / CY | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostiju "SIVERA" ul. Bolshaya Pochtovaya, d. 26 B, stroenie 1 Moscow 107082 / RU | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Obschestvo S Ogranichennoi Otvetstvennostiju "SIVERA" ul. Bolshaya Pochtovaya, d. 26 B, stroenie 1 Moscow 107082 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVANOV, Valery Filippovich ul. Molostovykh, 8-126 Moscow, 111555 / RU | 02 /
DJERMAKYAN, Karen Jurievich ul. Angarskaya, 22-4-176 Moscow, 127635 / RU | 03 /
ZUBAREV, Jury Borisovich Leningradsky pr., 24-32 Moscow, 125040 / RU | 04 /
PANFEROV, Fedor Konstantinovich ul. Krasnodonskaya, 18/18-1-17 Moscow, 109382 / RU | 05 /
SARIAN, Viliam Karpovich ul. Demiyana Bednogo, 19/2-98 Moscow, 123423 / RU | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Andersson, Björn, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 02768234.3 | 12.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002RU00424 | Priority number, date | RU20010124924 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: RU 2001124924 | [2004/29] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03024124 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1437899 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437899 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 26.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, H04W88/02, H04W88/04 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04W88/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W4/12 (KR);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | H04Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON INFORMATIONEN IM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSMODUS | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION MODE | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSMETTRE UN MESSAGE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2004 | Translation filed | 07.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4882765 (MAXWELL RAY F [CA], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO9742719 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figure 2 *; | [YD]WO0018040 (IVANOV VALERY FILIPPOVICH [RU]) [YD] 3-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6052558 (COOK DEAN LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0133738 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | EP1143641 [ ] (IVANOV VALERY FILIPPOVICH [RU]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5371781 (ARDON MENACHEM T [US]); | [A]US5090051 (MUPPIDI PRABHAKAR [US], et al); | [A]US5020091 (KROLOPP ROBERT K [US], et al); | [A]US5365573 (SAKAMOTO NARUHIKO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4882765 |