EP1540766 - REDUCTION OF NEAR AMBIGUITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUMMINEN, Michael Ljungkullen 37 S-433 66 Sävedalen / SE | [2009/24] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
NUMMINEN, Michael Ljundkullen 37 S-433 66 Sävedalen / SE | ||
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
NUMMINEN, Michael Gyllenstjärmans väg 8A S-371 40 Karlskrona / SE | Representative(s) | Ekwall, Peter Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Ekwall, Peter Albihns AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Schlossman, Ulf Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 02768248.3 | 30.08.2002 | [2005/24] | WO2002SE01554 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021513 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540766 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540766 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/01, H01Q21/00, G01S3/38 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01Q21/06 (EP,US);
G01S3/06 (EP,US);
G01S3/46 (EP,US);
H01Q25/002 (EP,US);
H01Q3/24 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG VON NAH-MEHRDEUTIGKEITEN | [2007/49] | English: | REDUCTION OF NEAR AMBIGUITIES | [2005/24] | French: | REDUCTION DES AMBIGUITES PROCHES | [2007/49] |
Former [2005/24] | VERRINGERUNG VON NAHAMBIGUITÜTEN | ||
Former [2005/24] | REDUCTION DES QUASI-AMBIGUITES | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 08.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | CZ | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | IT | 10.06.2009 | NL | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | IE | 30.08.2009 | LU | 30.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | DE | 02.03.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 30.08.2009 | ||
LU | 30.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
DE | 02.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 30.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
DE | 02.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 30.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
DE | 02.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 30.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
DE | 02.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4513385 (MURI DAVID L [US]); | [A]EP0520489 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]US6178140 (SCHLIETER HEIKO [DE]); | [A] - HODJAT F. ET AL., "Nonuniformly spaced linear and planar array antennas for sidelobe reduction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, (197803), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 198 - 204, XP002959096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1978.1141812 |