EP1442296 - BIOLOGICAL ASSAY DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGLESE, James 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
FERRER, Marc 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
HAMILTON, Aaron, C. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02768394.5 | 02.08.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US24469 | Priority number, date | US20010310599P | 07.08.2001 Original published format: US 310599 P | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03014698 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1442296 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/566, C12Q1/34, C12Q1/42 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCHES ASSAY-NACHWEISVERFAHREN | [2004/32] | English: | BIOLOGICAL ASSAY DETECTION METHOD | [2004/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ESSAI BIOLOGIQUE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9839471 (TROPIX INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * whole document, in particular claim 1, p. 13, lines 1-4 and fig. 1 *; | [A]EP0953574 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]WO0075167 (LJL BIOSYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * whole document, in particular claims 1, 13, 15 and 70 and fig. 5 *; | [Y] - ZUCK P ET AL, "Ligand-receptor Binding Measured by Laser-scanning Imaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199909), vol. 96, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11121 - 11127, XP002984871 [Y] 1-10 * whole document, in particular p. 11126, left col. and fig.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.20.11122 | [Y] - KOLB A J ET AL, "Tyrosine kinase assays adapted to homogeneous time-resolved fluorescence", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY 1998 UNITED KINGDOM, (1998), vol. 3, no. 7, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 333 - 342, XP002430573 [Y] 1-10 * whole document, in particular fig.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(98)01204-5 | [Y] - SONGYANG Z ET AL, "RECOGNITION OF UNIQUE CARBOXYL-TERMINAL MOTIFS BY DISTINCT PDZ DOMAINS", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (1997), vol. 275, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 73 - 77, XP000887129 [Y] 1-10 * whole document, in particular abstract and table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.275.5296.73 | [T] - FERRER MARC ET AL, "A PDZ domain-based detection system for enzymatic assays", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20020215), vol. 301, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 207 - 216, XP002430574 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2001.5497 | International search | [A]US2001004522 (BURKE THOMAS J [US], et al); | [XP]US2002197606 (CRAIG ROGER [GB]); | [A] - PAWSON ET AL., "Protein-protein interactions define spcigicity in signal transduction", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, (2000), vol. 14, pages 1027 - 1047, XP002970705 |