EP1428250 - CHEMICAL SURFACE DEPOSITION OF ULTRA-THIN SEMICONDUCTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DELAWARE Office of the Vice Provost for Research, 210 Hullihen Hall Newark, DE 19716-1551 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DELAWARE Office of the Vice Provost for Research, 210 Hullihen Hall Newark, DE 19716-1551 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCANDLESS, Brian, E. 243 W. Main Street Elkton, MD 21921 / US | 02 /
SHAFARMAN, William, N. 1905 N. Van Buren Street Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/25] | Valkonet, Rutger, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02768543.7 | 14.08.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002US25862 | Priority number, date | US20010942536 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: US 942536 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03021648 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428250 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/36 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
H01L31/1836 (EP,US);
C23C18/1204 (EP,US);
C23C18/1225 (EP,US);
C23C18/1291 (EP,US);
C23C26/02 (EP,US);
C23C6/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/02422 (EP,US);
H01L21/02485 (EP,US);
H01L21/02491 (EP,US);
H01L21/02502 (EP,US);
H01L21/02551 (EP,US);
H01L21/02557 (EP,US);
H01L21/02562 (EP,US);
H01L21/02568 (EP,US);
H01L21/02628 (EP,US);
H01L31/073 (EP,US);
H01L31/0749 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | H01L21/20, H01L21/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | 20.02.2004 | LT | 20.02.2004 | LV | 20.02.2004 | MK | 20.02.2004 | RO | 20.02.2004 | SI | 20.02.2004 | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE OBERFLÄCHENABLAGERUNG ULTRADÜNNER HALBLEITER | [2004/25] | English: | CHEMICAL SURFACE DEPOSITION OF ULTRA-THIN SEMICONDUCTORS | [2004/25] | French: | DEPOSITION CHIMIQUE EN SURFACE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ULTRA MINCES | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3148084 (HILL JAMES E, et al) [X] 1-27,29-32 * claim 1 * [Y] 28; | [XY]US3880633 (JORDAN JOHN F, et al) [X] 1-27,29-32 * claim - * [Y] 28; | [A]US4261802 (FULOP GABOR F, et al) [A] 1-32 * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 12 *; | [XY]US4447335 (LOEFFLER OTTO E [US], et al) [X] 1-27,29-32 * example B; claim 1 * [Y] 28; | [Y]US5689125 (VACCARO KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 28 * column 2, lines 26-40 *; | [A] - MONDAL A ET AL, "Deposition of cadmium chalcogenide thin films by a solution growth technique using triethanolamine as a complexing agent", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 0165-1633, (19830101), pages 431 - 438, (20030303), XP009122777 [A] 1-32 * 2. Experimental * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-1633(83)90016-3 | [A] - KAUR I ET AL, "Growth kinetics and polymorphism of chemically deposited CdS films", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (19800401), vol. 127, no. 4, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 943 - 948, XP009122768 [A] 1-32 * page 944, column L, line 18 - column R, line 16 * | International search | [Y]US4095006 (JORDAN JOHN FRANCIS, et al); | [Y]US5112410 (CHEN WEN S [US]) | [Y] - NAIR ET AL., "Opto-electronic characteristics of chemically deposited cadmium sulphide thin films", SEMICOND. SCI. TECHNOL., (1988), vol. 3, pages 134 - 145, XP002959149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/3/2/010 | [Y] - CHU ET AL., "Solution-grown cadmium sulfide films for photovoltaic devices", (1992), vol. 139, no. 9, pages 2243 - 2246, XP008102705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2221246 |