EP1435145 - PATHLOSS AIDED CLOSED LOOP POWER CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Sung-Hyuk 1531 8th Street Fort Lee, NJ 07024 / US | 02 /
OZLUTURK, Fatih 70 Willowdale Avenue Port Washington, NY 11050 / US | 03 /
ZEIRA, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 04 /
KOO, Chang-Soo 15 Zoranne Drive East Northport, NY 11731 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/28] | Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter, Patent.- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02768976.9 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US31742 | Priority number, date | US20010328327P | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 328327 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03032502 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435145 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04B7/005 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H04W52/228 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2618 (KR);
H04W52/221 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/226 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/242 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/243 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/248 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/36 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/28] | H04B7/185 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH WEGVERLUST UNTERSTÜTZTE LEISTUNGSREGELUNG IN GESCHLOSSENER SCHLEIFE | [2004/28] | English: | PATHLOSS AIDED CLOSED LOOP POWER CONTROL | [2004/28] | French: | COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE EN BOUCLE FERMEE A COMPENSATION D'AFFAIBLISSEMENT DE PROPAGATION | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 08.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0057576 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13,15-22,24-27 * pages 1-5,8-13; figures 3,4; claim 1 * [I] 5,14,23; | [X] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, "Performance Evaluation of Combined Closed-Loop/Open-Loop Power Control Scheme for TDD", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-99155, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (19990322), vol. RAN WG1, no. Nynà shamn; 19990322, XP050088249 [X] 1,2,10,11,19 * pages 1-3,5 * | [A] - QIANG SHEN ET AL, "Performance improvement of closed-loop power control in CDMA cellular mobile communication systems", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1996. MOBILE TECHNOLOGY FOR THE HUMAN RACE., IEEE 46TH ATLANTA, GA, USA 28 APRIL-1 MAY 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960428), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-3157-0, pages 56 - 60, XP010162347 [A] 5,14,23 * page 56, column 2 - page 57, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1996.503407 | International search | [X]US6144861 (SUNDELIN MAGNUS [SE], et al); | [A]US6072784 (AGRAWAL PRATHIMA [US], et al); | [AP]US6381230 (WHEATLEY III CHARLES E [US], et al); | [XP]US6377813 (KANSAKOSKI ANTTI [US], et al) |