EP1439786 - SEGMENTED ARM FOR HOLDING A STABILIZING TISSUE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex CT-Devices, Inc. 630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Teleflex-CT Devices Incorporated 630 West Germantown Pike, Suite 450 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states GENZYME CORPORATION One Kendall Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNT, Scott Four Meadowbrook Road Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 02 /
WEINSTEIN, Martin, J. 16 Rebecca Road South Dartmouth, MA 02748 / US | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | Pratt, Richard Wilson D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02769007.2 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002US32108 | Priority number, date | US20010008509 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: US 8509 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037190 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439786 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKARM ZUM HALTEN EINER GEWEBESTABILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/31] | English: | SEGMENTED ARM FOR HOLDING A STABILIZING TISSUE DEVICE | [2004/31] | French: | BRAS A SEGMENTS CON U POUR MAINTENIR UN DISPOSITIF DE STABILISATION TISSULAIRE | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 03.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 05.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0150946 (MEDIVAS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 5, line 32 * [Y] 12,13; | [Y]WO0154562 (HEARTPORT INC [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * page 15, lines 12-30 * * page 16, line 31 - page 17, line 16 *; | [A]US6264605 (SCIRICA PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 16 - column 8, line 14 *; | [A]WO0015119 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 14 * | by applicant | US5730757 | US5875782 | US6033362 | US6102854 | US5894843 | US5836311 | US5947896 | US5899425 |