EP1391025 - Linear compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/09] | LINEAR MOTOR AND LINEAR COMPRESSOR INCLUDING SAID MOTOR | ||
[2008/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL S.A. Avenida das Nações Unidas 12995 32 andar - Brooklin Novo 04578-000 São Paulo SP / BR | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states EMPRESA BRASILEIRA DE COMPRESSORES S/A - EMBRACO Rua Rui Barbosa 1020 89219-901 Joinville, SC / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LILIE, Dietmar, Erich, Bernhard Rua Orestes Guimaraes, 904 CEP-89204-060 Joinville, SC / BR | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02769441.3 | 13.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002BR00068 | Priority number, date | BR20010102566 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: BR 0102566 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02093714 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391025 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391025 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/18, H02K33/16, F04B35/04 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
F04B17/04 (KR);
H02K33/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2008/35] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Linearkompressor | [2008/34] | English: | Linear compressor | [2008/34] | French: | Compresseur linéaire | [2008/34] |
Former [2004/09] | LINEARMOTOR UND LINEARKOMPRESSOR MIT DEM LINEARMOTOR | ||
Former [2004/09] | LINEAR MOTOR AND LINEAR COMPRESSOR INCLUDING SAID MOTOR | ||
Former [2004/09] | MOTEUR LINEAIRE ET COMPRESSEUR LINEAIRE COMPRENANT CE MOTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6209328 (KIM SEON YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 8 *; | [X]EP0954086 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 39, line 28 - line 30; figures 1,2,22,24 *; | [X]JP2000297751 ; | [X]JPH10285898 ; | [DX]US5945748 (PARK JUNG SIK [KR], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,6 * figure 8 *; | [X]WO0129444 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000297751 A 20001024 (MATSUSHITA REFRIG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10285898 A 19981023 (NABCO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |