EP1387575 - BROADCAST PROGRAM PROCESSING APPARATUS, COMPUTER SYSTEM, BROADCAST PROGRAM EVALUATION SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Yasuhisa, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Kohei, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr. D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02769567.5 | 10.05.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002JP04580 | Priority number, date | JP20010139455 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001139455 | [2004/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02093909 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387575 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387575 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04N5/44, H04N5/765, H04N17/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H04H60/81 (EP,US);
H04N21/45 (KR);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US);
H04H60/74 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/4112 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/4263 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/4756 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N5/9305 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/488 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | H04N5/44, H04N5/765, H04N7/173, H04N17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/21] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RUNDSENDEPROGRAMMVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERSYSTEM, RUNDSENDEPROGRAMMBEWERTUNGSSYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2004/06] | English: | BROADCAST PROGRAM PROCESSING APPARATUS, COMPUTER SYSTEM, BROADCAST PROGRAM EVALUATION SYSTEM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2004/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE PROGRAMMES DIFFUSES, SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE, SYSTEME D'EVALUATION DE PROGRAMMES DIFFUSES ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2003 | Translation filed | 04.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5530469 (GARFINKLE NORTON [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column A *; | [Y]EP0929197 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]WO0011869 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12* page 10, line 20 - page 16, line 21 *; | [Y]EP1041821 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0088] *; | [A]WO0059223 (TIVO INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0115449 (SINGULARIS S A [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH1188863 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10248094 (XING INC, et al); | [Y]JPH10136312 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2001111984 (ADC TECHNOLOGY KK); | [XP]JP2001320743 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH09261609 (SHARP KK) | Examination | WO9904561 | EP0548286 |