EP1395310 - SEALING OF CANNULAE IN A STAGED IMPLANTATION OF VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/11] | STAGED IMPLANTATION OF VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICES | ||
[2008/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventrassist Pty Ltd 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODARD, John, Campbell 27 Wareemba Avenue Thornleigh, NSW 2120 / AU | 02 /
TANSLEY, Geoffrey, Douglas 41 Sprigg Place Mt Colah, NSW 2079 / AU | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02771599.4 | 21.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002AU00625 | Priority number, date | AU20010051420 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: AU 5142001 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02094348 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395310 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395310 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/12, A61M31/00, A61M39/20, A61M1/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/216 (EP,US);
A61M60/859 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | A61M1/12, A61M31/00, A61M39/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDICHTEN VON KANÜLEN IN DER STUFENWEISEN IMPLANTATION VON VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER VENTRIKELFUNKTION | [2008/10] | English: | SEALING OF CANNULAE IN A STAGED IMPLANTATION OF VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICES | [2008/10] | French: | COLMATAGE DES CANULES LORS D'UNE IMPLANTATION PAR ETAPES D'APPAREILS D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE | [2008/10] |
Former [2004/11] | STUFENWEISE IMPLANTATION VON VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER VENTRIKELFUNKTION | ||
Former [2004/11] | STAGED IMPLANTATION OF VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICES | ||
Former [2004/11] | IMPLANTATION PAR ETAPES D'APPAREILS D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 10.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 11.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | GB | 21.05.2009 | IE | 21.05.2009 | LU | 21.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | FR | 02.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
GB | 21.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
LU | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
GB | 21.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
GB | 21.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
GB | 21.05.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
IE | 21.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 31.12.2008 | |
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2000977 (BENTLEY LAB) [A] 1,3 * figures 5,7 *; | [A]GB2056282 (BENTLEY LAB) [A] 1,3* figures 4,5 *; | [X]US4936826 (AMARASINGHE DISAMODHA C) [X] 1-5 * column 5, lines 18-40; figures 6,7 * | International search | [X]US4573480 (HIRSCHBERG JAKUB [SE]); | [X]US4995857 (ARNOLD JOHN R [US]); | [X]US5098370 (RAHAT SHUMEL [IL], et al); | [X]US5219361 (VON RECUM ANDREAS F [US], et al); | [X]US5626562 (CASTRO ANTHONY J [US]); | [X]US5755762 (BUSH M ELIZABETH [US]); | [X]US5833664 (SEARE JR WILLIAM J [US]); | [X]US5879375 (LARSON JR CARL O [US], et al); | [X]US5941813 (SIEVERS HANS-HINRICH [DE], et al); | [X]US5989215 (DELMOTTE YVES [BE], et al); | [X]WO0018469 (BIOSURGICAL CORP [US]); | [Y]WO0038757 (KRITON MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0057948 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]); | [X]US6228018 (DOWNEY H FRED [US], et al); | [Y]US6227817 (PADEN BRADLEY E [US]) |