EP1396147 - BACKGROUND COMMERCIAL END DETECTOR AND NOTIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAJKOVIC, Miroslav Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GUTTA, Srinivas, V., R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
COLMENAREZ, Antonio Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02771691.9 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002IB01747 | Priority number, date | US20010862278 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: US 862278 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096102 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1396147 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (KR);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | HINTERGRUND-ERKENNUNGS- UND BENACHRICHTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS ENDE DER WERBUNG | [2004/11] | English: | BACKGROUND COMMERCIAL END DETECTOR AND NOTIFIER | [2004/11] | French: | DETECTEUR ET AVERTISSEUR DE FIN DE MESSAGE PUBLICITAIRE EN ARRIERE-PLAN | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 29.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19900932 (SETZER BERND [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4024695 (VENDEL KARL HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19757385 (SPEHR CLEMENTE [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-50 * * column 8, line 30 - column 12, line 2 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE19932020 (LAINER DIETMAR [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 58 * |