EP1358534 - CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH USAGE RULE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/45] | CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH USAGE RULE MANAGEMENT SERVER | ||
[2004/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Koji 3-4-1, Ueda Matsubara-shi, Osaka 580-0016 / JP | 02 /
WALTER, Stefan 1-3-8-302, Hashibahigashino-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0031 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Masaya 7-41, Higashimakino-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1151 / JP | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2003/45] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02771717.2 | 17.05.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002JP04779 | Priority number, date | JP20010152059 | 22.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001152059 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095551 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358534 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358534 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L29/06 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (KR);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT BENUTZUNGSREGELMANAGEMENT | [2004/38] | English: | CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH USAGE RULE MANAGEMENT | [2004/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CONTENU COMPORTANT UNE GESTION DE REGLES D'UTILISATION | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT BENUTZUNGSREGELMANAGEMENTSERVER | ||
Former [2003/45] | CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH USAGE RULE MANAGEMENT SERVER | ||
Former [2003/45] | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CONTENU COMPORTANT UN SERVEUR DE GESTION DE REGLES D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 09.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2005 | BE | 02.02.2005 | CH | 02.02.2005 | LI | 02.02.2005 | TR | 02.02.2005 | DK | 02.05.2005 | GR | 02.05.2005 | CY | 17.05.2005 | IE | 17.05.2005 | LU | 17.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | PT | 02.07.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 17.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
LU | 17.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 17.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
LU | 17.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
CY | 17.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
TR | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
IE | 17.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
GR | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | ||
CH | 02.02.2005 | ||
LI | 02.02.2005 | ||
DK | 02.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.02.2005 | |
BE | 02.02.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9714087 (ERICKSON JOHN S [US]) [A] 1,7-9,15 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 24 * * page 12, lines 22-28 * * page 14, lines 7-10 * * page 14, line 21 - page 15, line 8 ** page 23, lines 4-11 *; | [A]US5920861 (HALL EDWIN J [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9,15 * figure 17 * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 36 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 17, line 1 - line 40 *; | [A] - "SDMI SECURE DIGITAL MUSIC INITIATIVE", SDMI PORTABLE DEVICE SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.0, XX, XX, (19990708), no. PART 1, pages 1 - 35, XP000997330 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * |