EP1389791 - THERMAL FUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Ohaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENDA, Kenji 4-14-20-302, Miyuki Fukui-shi, Fukui 910-0854 / JP | 02 /
MUKAI, Takahiro 2-3-19-102, Jinguhigashi Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki 880-0056 / JP | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02771764.4 | 21.05.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002JP04917 | Priority number, date | JP20010150510 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001150510 | JP20010276311 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001276311 | [2004/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095783 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389791 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H37/76 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
H01H37/761 (EP,US);
H01H2037/768 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | THERMISCHE SICHERUNG | [2004/08] | English: | THERMAL FUSE | [2004/08] | French: | FUSIBLE THERMIQUE | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2003 | Translation filed | 21.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2808319 (UCHIHASHI METAL IND CO) [Y] 1* figures 1a-1d,4 *; | [Y]US5982268 (KAWANISHI TOSHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0831283 (UCHIHASHI ESTEC CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000113784 (UCHIHASHI ESTEC CO LTD); | [A]JP2000164093 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000322994 (UCHIHASHI ESTEC CO LTD); | [AE]JP2002226790 (ARAKAWA CHEM IND) | by applicant | JPH0831283 |