EP1416832 - DRIVE FOR FURNITURE FOR DISPLACING PARTS OF FURNITURE IN RELATION TO ONE ANOTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | 16.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINAK A/S Smedevænget 8 Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states LINAK A/S Smedevaenget 8, Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK | ||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states LINAK A/S Smedevaenget 8, Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states LINAK A/S Smedevaenget 8, Guderup 6430 Nordborg / DK | ||
For all designated states Cimosys Limited Le Gallais Chambers, 54 Bath Street St. Helier, Jersey JE4 8YD / GB | |||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Cimosys AG Schlossbüel 8638 Goldingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEWERT, Eckhart Mythenquai 26 CH-8002 Zürich / CH | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard Linak A/S Patent Department P.O. Box 238 9100 Aalborg / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard Linak A/S Patent Department P.O. Box 238 9100 Aalborg / DK | ||
Former [2007/28] | Wagner, Carsten Leine & Wagner Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/20] | Wagner, Carsten, et al Leine & Wagner Patentanwälte Burckhardtstrasse 1 30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02772121.6 | 05.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002EP08694 | Priority number, date | DE20011038025 | 08.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10138025 | [2004/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015585 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416832 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416832 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1416832 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47C20/04 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A47C20/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBELANTRIEB ZUM VERSTELLEN VON TEILEN EINES MÖBELS RELATIV ZUEINANDER | [2004/20] | English: | DRIVE FOR FURNITURE FOR DISPLACING PARTS OF FURNITURE IN RELATION TO ONE ANOTHER | [2004/20] | French: | ENTRAINEMENT DE MEUBLE DESTINE A DEPLACER DES ELEMENTS D'UN MEUBLE LES UNS PAR RAPPORT AUX AUTRES | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.2007
17.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH Weststrasse 1 32278 Kirchlengern / DE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.2007
Dewert Antriebs- und Systemtechnik GmbH Weststrasse 1 32278 Kirchlengern / DE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | 25.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.11.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.07.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | FR | 21.06.2006 | GB | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | AT | 05.08.2006 | LU | 05.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
FR | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
LU | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
LU | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
FR | 04.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
FR | 04.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
FR | 04.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
FR | 04.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
AT | 05.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
GB | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0583660 (CIAR SRL [IT]) [AD] 11,12,14-16 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 49 *; | [X]DE29601605U (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,11,14,19-21 * pages 3-6 *; | [X]DE29521893U (KOCH DIETMAR [DE]) [X] 1,6,11,12 * page 11, lines 29-38; figures 12,13 *; | [X]EP0919746 (HANNING ELEKTRO WERKE [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,11,12,14-16 * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 48; figures 8,9 *; | [X]DE29908362U (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,11,13,14 * pages 4-7 *; | [A]DE10017979 (CIMOSYS AG GOLDINGEN [CH]) [A] 11,14-17,20* column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 11 *; | [X]DE19962538 (CIMOSYS AG GOLDINGEN [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,11,12,14,19-21 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 58; figure 2 *; | [PX]WO0200065 (CIMOSYS AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1,2,6,11,14-17,19-21 * page 19, line 15 - page 20, line 7; figures 9,10 * | Examination | CH421382 | DE4136373 | DE19718255 | by applicant | DE3842078 | EP0372032 | EP0583660 | DE10017978 | Opposition | US3089150 | DE3103922 | EP0214695 | EP0153362 | DE8229628U | DE8806094U | DE9212600U | DE9318082U | DE29603173U | EP0887031 | EP0919746 | DE29920996U | DE10017978 | DE10046751 | DE19962538 |